LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB308
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB308
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB308
Compare Versions
AB308 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB308 Enrolled September 8, 2010
AB308 Amended August 19, 2010
AB308 Amended June 23, 2010
AB308 Amended June 9, 2010
AB308 Amended May 11, 2009
AB308 Introduced February 17, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB308 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB308 Enrolled September 8, 2010
AB308 Amended August 19, 2010
AB308 Amended June 23, 2010
AB308 Amended June 9, 2010
AB308 Amended May 11, 2009
AB308 Introduced February 17, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare