|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 2975.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 2064.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 1459.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|