LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB329
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB329
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB329
Compare Versions
AB329 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB329 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB329 Amended July 23, 2009
AB329 Amended May 27, 2009
AB329 Amended May 7, 2009
AB329 Amended April 29, 2009
AB329 Amended April 16, 2009
AB329 Amended April 13, 2009
AB329 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB329 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB329 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB329 Amended July 23, 2009
AB329 Amended May 27, 2009
AB329 Amended May 7, 2009
AB329 Amended April 29, 2009
AB329 Amended April 16, 2009
AB329 Amended April 13, 2009
AB329 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare