California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2009

Enrolled

Bill October 11, 2010

Chaptered

Bill October 19, 2010

Amended

Bill October 6, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill May 18, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009