LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB342
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB342
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB342
Compare Versions
AB342 Chaptered October 19, 2010
AB342 Enrolled October 11, 2010
AB342 Amended October 6, 2010
AB342 Amended August 2, 2010
AB342 Amended June 23, 2010
AB342 Amended May 18, 2009
AB342 Amended April 13, 2009
AB342 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB342 Chaptered October 19, 2010
AB342 Enrolled October 11, 2010
AB342 Amended October 6, 2010
AB342 Amended August 2, 2010
AB342 Amended June 23, 2010
AB342 Amended May 18, 2009
AB342 Amended April 13, 2009
AB342 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare