|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 3904.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and J.,E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 29.)
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|