LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB35
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB35
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB35
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2008
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 2, 2010
Compare
Bill
June 29, 2010
Compare
Bill
June 15, 2010
Compare
Bill
May 12, 2010
Compare
Bill
January 4, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2009
Compare