|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5918.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4100.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1367.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|