California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2009

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2010

Amended

Bill June 7, 2010
Bill April 22, 2009