|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3280.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2132.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1627.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|