LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB356
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB356
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB356
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 19, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 16, 2009
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 11, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 25, 2009
Compare
Bill
August 17, 2009
Compare
Bill
June 15, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 23, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 21, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2009
Compare