|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3167.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2208.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1528.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1439.).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|