California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 2, 2009
Bill June 16, 2009
Bill May 14, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009