|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 1757.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1458.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1363.).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|