California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB392 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2009

Chaptered

Bill August 6, 2009

Amended

Bill May 11, 2009
Bill May 4, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009