|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 3264.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2291.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 4). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1375.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1240.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|