LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB399
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB399
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB399
Compare Versions
AB399 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB399 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB399 Amended August 27, 2009
AB399 Amended June 29, 2009
AB399 Amended June 17, 2009
AB399 Amended May 26, 2009
AB399 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB399 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB399 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB399 Amended August 27, 2009
AB399 Amended June 29, 2009
AB399 Amended June 17, 2009
AB399 Amended May 26, 2009
AB399 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare