|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3286.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2316.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1356.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|