LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB407
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB407
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB407
Compare Versions
AB407 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB407 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB407 Amended September 3, 2009
AB407 Amended September 1, 2009
AB407 Amended April 21, 2009
AB407 Amended April 13, 2009
AB407 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB407 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB407 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB407 Amended September 3, 2009
AB407 Amended September 1, 2009
AB407 Amended April 21, 2009
AB407 Amended April 13, 2009
AB407 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare