|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 6919.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4993.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 3909.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|