LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB408
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB408
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB408
Compare Versions
AB408 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB408 Amended August 20, 2010
AB408 Amended August 2, 2010
AB408 Amended June 29, 2010
AB408 Amended April 5, 2010
AB408 Amended January 4, 2010
AB408 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB408 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB408 Amended August 20, 2010
AB408 Amended August 2, 2010
AB408 Amended June 29, 2010
AB408 Amended April 5, 2010
AB408 Amended January 4, 2010
AB408 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare