|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5732.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3945.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3884.)
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|