LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB419
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB419
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB419
Compare Versions
AB419 Chaptered July 6, 2010
AB419 Enrolled June 22, 2010
AB419 Amended May 17, 2010
AB419 Amended January 14, 2010
AB419 Amended January 5, 2010
AB419 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB419 Chaptered July 6, 2010
AB419 Enrolled June 22, 2010
AB419 Amended May 17, 2010
AB419 Amended January 14, 2010
AB419 Amended January 5, 2010
AB419 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare