|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 6790.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4797.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 1357.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|