LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB441
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB441
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB441
Compare Versions
AB441 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB441 Enrolled September 8, 2010
AB441 Amended March 4, 2010
AB441 Amended April 2, 2009
AB441 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB441 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB441 Enrolled September 8, 2010
AB441 Amended March 4, 2010
AB441 Amended April 2, 2009
AB441 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare