|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3096.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2102.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1842.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|