LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB444
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB444
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB444
Compare Versions
AB444 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB444 Amended September 1, 2009
AB444 Amended June 23, 2009
AB444 Amended April 15, 2009
AB444 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB444 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB444 Amended September 1, 2009
AB444 Amended June 23, 2009
AB444 Amended April 15, 2009
AB444 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare