California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB482 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Amended

Bill July 15, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010
Bill September 2, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009