LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB482
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB482
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB482
Compare Versions
AB482 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB482 Amended July 15, 2010
AB482 Amended April 8, 2010
AB482 Amended September 2, 2009
AB482 Amended August 17, 2009
AB482 Amended June 1, 2009
AB482 Amended April 22, 2009
AB482 Amended April 2, 2009
AB482 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB482 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB482 Amended July 15, 2010
AB482 Amended April 8, 2010
AB482 Amended September 2, 2009
AB482 Amended August 17, 2009
AB482 Amended June 1, 2009
AB482 Amended April 22, 2009
AB482 Amended April 2, 2009
AB482 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare