|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 1954.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|