LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB526
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB526
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB526
Compare Versions
AB526 Amended August 19, 2009
AB526 Amended July 15, 2009
AB526 Amended June 1, 2009
AB526 Amended April 16, 2009
AB526 Amended April 14, 2009
AB526 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB526 Amended August 19, 2009
AB526 Amended July 15, 2009
AB526 Amended June 1, 2009
AB526 Amended April 16, 2009
AB526 Amended April 14, 2009
AB526 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare