|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 113, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2381.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1427.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Corrected June 22.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1369.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|