California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill July 9, 2009

Chaptered

Bill August 6, 2009

Amended

Bill June 9, 2009
Bill March 31, 2009