LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB531
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB531
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB531
Compare Versions
AB531 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB531 Enrolled September 4, 2009
AB531 Amended June 11, 2009
AB531 Amended April 23, 2009
AB531 Amended April 13, 2009
AB531 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB531 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB531 Enrolled September 4, 2009
AB531 Amended June 11, 2009
AB531 Amended April 23, 2009
AB531 Amended April 13, 2009
AB531 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare