California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB531 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 531CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 323 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Saldana FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to amend Section 25402.10 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 531, Saldana. Energy consumption data: disclosure. Existing law requires an owner or operator, on and after January 1, 2010, to disclose the United States Environmental Protection Agency's ENERGY STAR Portfolio Manager benchmarking data and rating to a prospective buyer, lessee of the entire building, or lender that would finance the entire building. The bill instead would require the owner or operator to disclose the benchmarking data and rating to a prospective buyer, lessee of the entire building, or lender that would finance the entire building based on a schedule of compliance established by the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25402.10 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25402.10. (a) On and after January 1, 2009, electric and gas utilities shall maintain records of the energy consumption data of all nonresidential buildings to which they provide service. This data shall be maintained, in a format compatible for uploading to the United States Environmental Protection Agency's ENERGY STAR Portfolio Manager, for at least the most recent 12 months. (b) On and after January 1, 2009, upon the written authorization or secure electronic authorization of a nonresidential building owner or operator, an electric or gas utility shall upload all of the energy consumption data for the account specified for a building to the United States Environmental Protection Agency's ENERGY STAR Portfolio Manager in a manner that preserves the confidentiality of the customer. (c) In carrying out this section, an electric or gas utility may use any method for providing the specified data in order to maximize efficiency and minimize overall program cost, and is encouraged to work with the United States Environmental Protection Agency and customers in developing reasonable reporting options. (d) (1) Based on a schedule developed by the commission pursuant to paragraph (2) an owner or operator of a nonresidential building shall disclose the United States Environmental Protection Agency's ENERGY STAR Portfolio Manager benchmarking data and ratings for the most recent 12-month period to a prospective buyer, lessee of the entire building, or lender that would finance the entire building. If the data is delivered to a prospective buyer, lessee, or lender, a property owner, operator, or his or her agent is not required to provide additional information, and the information shall be deemed to be adequate to inform the prospective buyer, lessee, or lender regarding the United States Environmental Protection Agency's ENERGY STAR Portfolio Manager benchmarking data and ratings for the most recent 12-month period for the building that is being sold, leased, financed, or refinanced. (2) The commission shall establish a schedule by which an owner or operator is required to meet the requirements of this subdivision. (e) Notwithstanding subdivision (d), this section does not increase or decrease the duties, if any, of a property owner, operator, or his or her broker or agent under this chapter or alter the duty of a seller, agent, or broker to disclose the existence of a material fact affecting the real property.