LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB54
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB54
Action History
02/02/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
03/27/2009
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
03/26/2009
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
12/08/2008
Read first time.
12/05/2008
From printer. May be heard in committee January 4.
12/04/2008
Introduced. To print.