California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB54 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 03/26/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 54AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jeffries DECEMBER 4, 2008 An act relating to the California Emergency Management Agency. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 54, as amended, Jeffries. State government: California Emergency Management Agency. Existing law establishes, within the office of the Governor, the California Emergency Management Agency under the supervision of a Secretary of California Emergency Management. Existing law also establishes the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, within the  Natural  Resources Agency, and the Office of the State Fire Marshal, within that department. Existing law further establishes, within the Office of the State Fire Marshal, the State Board of Fire Services, consisting of 18 members. Existing law establishes the Department of the California Highway Patrol, within the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency, under the supervision of the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol. Existing law also establishes, within the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency, the Office of Traffic Safety, under the supervision of a director. Existing law establishes the California Conservation Corps, within the  Natural  Resources Agency, and the Emergency Medical Services Authority, within the  Health and Welfare   California Health and Human Services  Agency. This bill would  state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to transfer   require  the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, the Office of the State Fire Marshal, the State Board of Fire Services, the Department of the California Highway Patrol, the Office of Traffic Safety, the California Conservation Corps, and the Emergency Medical Services Authority to  the office of the Governor under the California Emergency Management Agency   create a working group, by March 1, 2010, to prepare a Governor's Reorganization Plan that would transfer the authorities and duties of those departments, offices, and entities to the California Emergency Management Agency. The bill would require the working group to develop the proposed Governor's Reorganization Plan, so that the Governor may transmit the plan to the Legislature for approval during the 2011 portion of the 2011-12 Regular Session of the Legislature. The bill would require the plan to provide that it would become operative no later than January 1, 2012  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   (a) On or before March 1, 2010, the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, the Office of the State Fire Marshal, the State Board of Fire Services, the Department of the California Highway Patrol, the Office of Traffic Safety, the California Conservation Corps, and the Emergency Medical Services Authority shall create a working group to prepare a Governor's Reorganization Plan in accordance with Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 12080) of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, that would transfer the authorities and duties of these departments, offices, and entities to the California Emergency Management Agency, as created pursuant to Section 8585 of the Government Code.   (b) The working group created pursuant to subdivision (a) shall develop the proposed Governor's Reorganization Plan so that the Governor may transmit the plan to the Legislature for approval during the 2011 portion of the 2011-12 Regular Session of the Legislature.   (c) The Governor's Reorganization Plan developed pursuant to this section shall provide that the plan shall become operative no later than January 1, 2012.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to transfer the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, the Office of the State Fire Marshal, the State Board of Fire Services, the Department of the California Highway Patrol, the Office of Traffic Safety, the California Conservation Corps, and the Emergency Medical Services Authority to the office of the Governor under the California Emergency Management Agency.