California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Amended

Bill August 17, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill June 18, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009