LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB542
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB542
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB542
Compare Versions
AB542 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB542 Amended August 17, 2010
AB542 Amended August 2, 2010
AB542 Amended July 15, 2010
AB542 Amended June 23, 2010
AB542 Amended June 18, 2009
AB542 Amended May 5, 2009
AB542 Amended April 22, 2009
AB542 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB542 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB542 Amended August 17, 2010
AB542 Amended August 2, 2010
AB542 Amended July 15, 2010
AB542 Amended June 23, 2010
AB542 Amended June 18, 2009
AB542 Amended May 5, 2009
AB542 Amended April 22, 2009
AB542 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare