|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3097.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2108.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Ordered to third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1468.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|