LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB577
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB577
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB577
Compare Versions
AB577 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB577 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB577 Amended August 31, 2009
AB577 Amended June 11, 2009
AB577 Amended May 26, 2009
AB577 Amended April 13, 2009
AB577 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB577 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB577 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB577 Amended August 31, 2009
AB577 Amended June 11, 2009
AB577 Amended May 26, 2009
AB577 Amended April 13, 2009
AB577 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare