|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6216.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4463.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3862.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|