California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010
Bill January 13, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010