|
05/17/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4973.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3381.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2291.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 986.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|