California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2010

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2010

Amended

Bill April 21, 2010
Bill September 3, 2009