|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5840.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5726.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3941.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 1929.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|