LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB586
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB586
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB586
Compare Versions
AB586 Chaptered July 15, 2010
AB586 Enrolled June 30, 2010
AB586 Amended March 23, 2010
AB586 Amended July 2, 2009
AB586 Amended June 30, 2009
AB586 Amended May 7, 2009
AB586 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB586 Chaptered July 15, 2010
AB586 Enrolled June 30, 2010
AB586 Amended March 23, 2010
AB586 Amended July 2, 2009
AB586 Amended June 30, 2009
AB586 Amended May 7, 2009
AB586 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare