|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2846.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1975.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1547.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
12/08/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/05/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|