California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2008

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 9, 2009
Bill May 11, 2009