|
04/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4786.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3199.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Maldonado.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1846.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|